Telligen, Inc. v. Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Telligen, Inc.
Defendant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv00261
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Office: Central Office
County: Polk
0 Judge: Helen C Adams
1 Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
2 Judge: Stephen B Jackson
3 Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference shall be held on October 23, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in the United States Courthouse in Des Moines, Iowa, before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by October 16, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 9/28/2018. (jeb)
September 26, 2018 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company., filed by Telligen, Inc..(Lorentzen, John)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Marie Lucas on behalf of Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company (Lucas, Catherine)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lisa S. Brogan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 9/21/2018. (kjw)
September 21, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3603673 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. (OBrien, Sean)
September 21, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Special and Affirmative Defenses by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company.(OBrien, Sean)
September 13, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. (OBrien, Sean)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. As requested, defendant Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company shall have until September 21, 2018, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 8/30/2018. (jeb)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (OBrien, Sean)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 Errata Correction of missing Page 6 re #1 Complaint, filed by Telligen, Inc.. (Lorentzen, John)
August 20, 2018 Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger and Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr added. Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams and Chief Judge John A. Jarvey no longer assigned to case. (don)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Telligen, Inc.. Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Lorentzen, John)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 Errata Page 5 re #1 Complaint, filed by Telligen, Inc.. (Lorentzen, John)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. McGuire on behalf of Telligen, Inc. (McGuire, Matthew)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Telligen, Inc.. (Lorentzen, John)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Telligen, Inc. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3566564., filed by Telligen, Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 11/8/2018. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/8/2018.(Lorentzen, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Telligen, Inc. v. Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Sean M OBrien
Represented By: Catherine Marie Lucas
Represented By: Lisa Sopata Brogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telligen, Inc.
Represented By: John F Lorentzen
Represented By: Matthew A. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?