Manglik v. VA Central Iowa Healthcare System et al
Plaintiff: Ashok Manglik
Defendant: Robert Wilkie, Kay Witter, Department of Veterans Affairs, Central Iowa Health Care System, United States of America, Gail Graham, Jerry Blow, VA Central Iowa Healthcare System and United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 4:2018cv00263
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Office: Central Office
County: Polk
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
2 Judge: Ross A Walters(R)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Enforce Judgment/Settlement filed by United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America, VA Central Iowa Healthcare System, Robert Wilkie. Replies due by 10/12/2018.(Faith, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America, VA Central Iowa Healthcare System, Robert Wilkie.(Faith, David)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting #16 defendants' unopposed motion to extend deadlines and terminating defendants' motion to dismiss #9 . Defendants shall have to and including 10/5/2018 to move or plead in response to plaintiff's Second Amended and Substituted Complaint #10 and Motion for an Immediate Hearing for Review of Motion for Injunctive Relief #2 . Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters (R) on 9/21/2018.(kln)
September 21, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to Plaintiff's Second Amended and Subsituted Complaint and Motion for Immediate Hearing for Review of Motion for Injunctive Relief and Court Orders to Enforce Terms of the Settlement Contract by United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America, VA Central Iowa Healthcare System, Robert Wilkie.Motions referred to Ross A Walters(R). Responses due by 10/5/2018. (Faith, David)
September 21, 2018 Filing 15 WITHDRAWAL OF #9 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by VA Central Iowa Healthcare System, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Robert Wilkie, and United States of America. (Faith, David)
September 21, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION by United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America, VA Central Iowa Healthcare System, Robert Wilkie. (Faith, David)
September 13, 2018 Filing 13 ***REPLY**RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ashok Manglik. Replies due by 9/20/2018.(Sellers, Michael) Modified on 9/14/2018 updated event to show as a reply. (don).
September 13, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America, VA Central Iowa Healthcare System, Robert Wilkie.(Faith, David)
September 12, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ashok Manglik. Replies due by 9/19/2018.(Sellers, Michael)
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. All Defendants., filed by Ashok Manglik.(Sellers, Michael)
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America, VA Central Iowa Healthcare System, Robert Wilkie.Motions referred to Ross A Walters(R). Responses due by 9/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Faith, David)
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David L.D. Faith on behalf of United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America, VA Central Iowa Healthcare System, Robert Wilkie (Faith, David)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff does not object. Defendant shall have to and including 9/7/2018 to respond to the Amended Motion for an Immediate Hearing for Review of this Motion for Injunctive Relief and for Court Orders to enforce the Terms of a Settlement Contract #4 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 8/21/2018. (kln)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Motion by United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America, VA Central Iowa Healthcare System, Robert Wilkie.Motions referred to Ross A Walters(R). Responses due by 9/4/2018. (Luxa, Mary)
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary C Luxa on behalf of All Defendants (Luxa, Mary)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE re #2 MOTION to Enforce Judgment/Settlement-Amended and Substituted. (kmc)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Department of Veterans Affairs, Central Iowa Health Care System, United States of America, Robert Wilkie. Party Kay Witter (Quality Management Administator and Attorney, VA Central Iowa HealthCare System), Jerry Blow (M.D. Medical Director of the VA Central Iowa HealthCare System) and Gail Graham (Director, VA Central Iowa HealthCare System) terminated., filed by Ashok Manglik. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Amended and Substituted, #2 Affidavit Amended and Substituted, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Amended and Substituted, #4 Motion for an Immediate Hearing for Review of this Motion for Injunctive Relief and for Court Orders to enforce the Terms of a Settlement Contract)(Sellers, Michael)
August 13, 2018 Judge Stephanie M. Rose added. Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger no longer assigned to case. (don)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Enforce Judgment/Settlement and Motion for Injunctive Relief by Ashok Manglik.Motions referred to Ross A Walters(R). Responses due by 8/24/2018. (don)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3566906., filed by Ashok Manglik. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Affidavit, #3 Motion for an Immediate Hearing for Review of this Motion for Injunctive Relief and for Court Orders to enforce the Terms of a Settlement Contract, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sellers, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manglik v. VA Central Iowa Healthcare System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wilkie
Represented By: Mary C Luxa
Represented By: David L.D. Faith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Witter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs, Central Iowa Health Care System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Mary C Luxa
Represented By: David L.D. Faith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Blow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VA Central Iowa Healthcare System
Represented By: Mary C Luxa
Represented By: David L.D. Faith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: Mary C Luxa
Represented By: David L.D. Faith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashok Manglik
Represented By: Michael M Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?