Noah's Inc. v. Noah Corporation
Plaintiff: Noah's Inc.
Defendant: Noah Corporation
Case Number: 4:2018cv00272
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Office: Central Office
County: Adair
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Copyright/Patent/Trademark Complaint #1 by Noah Corporation.(Kerndt, Allison)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noah's Inc.. Noah Corporation served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Lebron-Dykeman, Christine)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 1,961,874 and 2,068,328. (vr)
August 16, 2018 Set Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 9/4/2018. (vr)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COPYRIGHT/PATENT/TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against Noah Corporation Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3569529., filed by Noah's Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 11/13/2018. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A_1,961,874 Reg. Cert., #2 Exhibit Ex. B_ 1961874 Section 8 and 15 Acceptance, #3 Exhibit Ex. C_2068328 Reg. Cert., #4 Exhibit Ex. D_ 2068328 Section 8 and 15 Acceptance, #5 Exhibit Ex. E_395362 Reg. Cert., #6 Exhibit Ex. F_395361 Reg. Cert., #7 Exhibit Ex. G_Order Sustaining Opposition)(Lebron-Dykeman, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noah's Inc. v. Noah Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noah Corporation
Represented By: Allison Elizabeth Kerndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah's Inc.
Represented By: Christine Lebron-Dykeman
Represented By: Nicholas Krob
Represented By: Michael C Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?