Goodson v. Napha Care et al
Plaintiff: Mario Goodson
Defendant: Judges of the First Judicial District Court of Black Hawk County, Napha Care, Black Hawk County Sheriff's Department and Joel Dalrymple
Case Number: 4:2018cv00277
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Office: Central Office
County: Polk
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: James E Gritzner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 Clerk's Letter to Plaintiff re transfer of case to the Northern District. (krn)
August 21, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated. Transferred to Northern District of Iowa. (krn)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring case to Northern District of Iowa. See order for particulars. Signed by Senior Judge James E. Gritzner on 8/20/2018. (nlh)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mario Goodson. (kjw)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Black Hawk County Sheriff's Department, Joel Dalrymple, Judges of the First Judicial District Court of Black Hawk County, Napha Care, filed by Mario Goodson. (kjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodson v. Napha Care et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judges of the First Judicial District Court of Black Hawk County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Napha Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Hawk County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Dalrymple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Goodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?