Thede v. Hunter Warfield, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Thede
Defendant: Hunter Warfield, Inc. and Mansions at Hemingway, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00288
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to File an Answer for Defendant Hunter Warfield, Inc. As requested, defendant Hunter Warfield, Inc. shall have until October 11, 2018, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 9/26/2018. (jeb)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Patricia Thede.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Marks, Samuel)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia Thede. Mansions at Hemingway, LLC served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (Marks, Samuel)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia Thede. Hunter Warfield, Inc. served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (Marks, Samuel)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hunter Warfield, Inc., Mansions at Hemingway, LLC Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3585480., filed by Patricia Thede. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/3/2018. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/3/2018.(Marks, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thede v. Hunter Warfield, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Thede
Represented By: Samuel Z Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Warfield, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mansions at Hemingway, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?