White v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston

Plaintiff: Amanda White
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 4:2018cv00292
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Elgin, Susan)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston answer due 11/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/12/2018. (mlr)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven L. Severson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/12/2018. (kjw)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3621202 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Severson, Steven)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Elgin, Susan)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda White. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Neifert, Jason)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amanda White (Neifert, Jason)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3589230., filed by Amanda White. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/5/2018. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/5/2018.(Neifert, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Steven L Severson
Represented By: Susan Patricia Elgin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda White
Represented By: Jason David Neifert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?