Fansteel Foundry Corporation v. Zamec, II et al

Plaintiff: official committee of unsecured creditors and Fansteel Foundry Corporation
Defendant: Leonard M. Levie, Earl F. White, Fansteel, Inc., Fansteel ENA USA, Inc., FMRI, Inc., Wellman Dynamics Machinery & Assembly, Inc., Todd M. Hymel, Curtis J. Zamec, II, John Does 1-20, 510 Ocean Drive Debt Acquisition, LLC, Brian F. Cassady, David E. Leitten, Marcus Collardin and Fansteel Inc
Case Number: 4:2018cv00304
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 11:0548
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Plead as to Curtis J. Zamec, II. Defendant has up to and including 12/15/2018 to file its responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 11/9/2018.(mkh)
November 9, 2018 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Plead by Curtis J. Zamec, II.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Fielding, Michael)
November 6, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R Kruse on behalf of 510 Ocean Drive Debt Acquisition, LLC, Leonard M. Levie (Kruse, Bradley)
October 26, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fansteel Foundry Corporation. David E. Leitten served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (Stanger, Kristina)
October 24, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fansteel Foundry Corporation. Fansteel Inc served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Stanger, Kristina)
October 24, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fansteel Foundry Corporation. Wellman Dynamics Machinery & Assembly, Inc. served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Stanger, Kristina)
October 22, 2018 TEXT ORDER: Due to a change in the Court's schedule, Status Conference is RESET for 11/28/2018 at 09:00 AM by Phone Hearing before Judge Stephanie M. Rose. At the time of the telephonic status conference, counsel should call the Courts conference line (1-888-808-6929) and at the prompt enter 2486346 to join the conference. (mkh) Modified on 10/22/2018 (mkh).
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fansteel Foundry Corporation. Todd M. Hymel served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. (Stanger, Kristina)
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fansteel Foundry Corporation. 510 Ocean Drive Debt Acquisition, LLC served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Stanger, Kristina)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Curtis J. Zamec, II answer due 11/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/12/2018. (mlr)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Status Conference is set for 11/20/2018 at 09:00 AM by Phone Hearing before Judge Stephanie M. Rose. At the time of the telephonic status conference, counsel should call the Courts conference line (1-888-808-6929) and at the prompt enter 2486346 to join the conference. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 10/10/2018. (mkh)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Curtis J. Zamec, II.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Fielding, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Fielding on behalf of Curtis J. Zamec, II (Fielding, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fansteel Foundry Corporation. Fansteel ENA USA, Inc. served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (Stanger, Kristina)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fansteel Foundry Corporation. FMRI, Inc. served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (Stanger, Kristina)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Fansteel Foundry Corporation. (Stanger, Kristina)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fansteel Foundry Corporation. Curtis J. Zamec, II served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018. (Stanger, Kristina)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin H Collins on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Collins, Kevin)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3595581., filed by official committee of unsecured creditors. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/11/2018. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/11/2018. (Attachments: #1Exhibit A, #2Exhibit B)(Stanger, Kristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fansteel Foundry Corporation v. Zamec, II et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard M. Levie
Represented By: Bradley R Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl F. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fansteel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fansteel ENA USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMRI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellman Dynamics Machinery & Assembly, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd M. Hymel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis J. Zamec, II
Represented By: Michael D. Fielding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 510 Ocean Drive Debt Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: Bradley R Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian F. Cassady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E. Leitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Collardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fansteel Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: official committee of unsecured creditors
Represented By: Kristina M Stanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fansteel Foundry Corporation
Represented By: Kristina M Stanger
Represented By: Kevin H Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?