Davison v. Care Initiatives Inc

Plaintiff: Alandria N Davison
Defendant: Care Initiatives Inc
Case Number: 4:2018cv00311
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Robert W Pratt
Referring Judge: Ross A Walters(R)
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 Errata re #7 Designation of Expert Witnesses filed by Alandria N Davison. (Erbe, Harley)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 Designation of Expert Witnesses by Alandria N Davison. (Erbe, Harley)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Care Initiatives Inc. (Bauer, Erika)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 10/10/2018. (kln)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER adopting #3 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 10/29/2018. Motions to Add Parties due by 12/17/2018. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/17/2018. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 1/15/2019. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 3/15/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 4/15/2019. Discovery Deadline 6/17/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadline 7/15/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 11:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R). Jury Trial set for 3/16/2020 at 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South before Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt. Estimated 5 days. See order for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 10/10/2018. (kln)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Erbe, Harley)
September 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 10/11/2018. Corporate packet emailed to counsel. (kjw)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Care Initiatives Inc.(Knowles, Kelsey)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Care Initiatives Inc from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number LACL141502. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3602573., filed by Care Initiatives Inc. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Rule 81.1 Certificate)(Knowles, Kelsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davison v. Care Initiatives Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Initiatives Inc
Represented By: Michael R Reck
Represented By: James R Swanger
Represented By: Kelsey J Knowles
Represented By: Erika Lauren Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alandria N Davison
Represented By: Harley C Erbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?