Katecho, Inc. et al v. Continental Manufacturing Chemist, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Surmasis Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Katecho, Inc.
Defendant: Aaron Summerkamp, Continental Manufacturing Chemist, Inc., Constance Collom and Amanda Summerkamp
Case Number: 4:2018cv00314
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated. Stipulation of Dismissal filed. (rmj)
November 13, 2018 Filing 32 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and Order for Dismissal with Prejudice by Katecho, Inc., Surmasis Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Penick, Bridget)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER Granting #29 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Reconsider. Plaintiffs' deadline to file a response to Defendants' Motion to Reconsider is extended to 11/12/2018. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 11/2/2018. (hfh)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER Granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Deposit Funds. Plaintiffs' deadline to deposit the previously ordered bond is extended to 11/12/2018. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 11/2/2018. (hfh)
November 1, 2018 Filing 29 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance (Expedited Relief Requested) by Katecho, Inc., Surmasis Pharmaceutical, Inc..Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 11/15/2018. (Penick, Bridget)
November 1, 2018 Filing 28 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Deposit Funds (Expedited Relief Requested) by Katecho, Inc., Surmasis Pharmaceutical, Inc..Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 11/15/2018. (Penick, Bridget)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Re: Deposit of Funds Into the Court's Registry. See Order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 10/22/2018. (hfh)
October 19, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Reconsideration re #25 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, **Expedited Relief Requested** by Constance Collom, Aaron Summerkamp, Amanda Summerkamp.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 11/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Vaught, Lindsay)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Motion is granted as to Defendant Aaron Summerkamp, Defendant Amanda Summerkamp, and Defendant Constance Collom. The Motion is denied as to Defendant CMC. See Order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 10/16/2018. (hfh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Continental Manufacturing Chemist, Inc.. (Johnson, Alexander)
October 12, 2018 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Katecho, Inc., Surmasis Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Penick, Bridget)
October 2, 2018 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC EXHIBITS by Constance Collom, Aaron Summerkamp, Amanda Summerkamp Exhibit Y (Vaught, Lindsay)
October 1, 2018 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger: Day 2 of Motion Hearing held on 10/1/2018 re #3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Evidentiary Hearing filed by Katecho, Inc., Surmasis Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Court Reporter Terri Martin.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Witness List) (time in court 5 hr 26 min) (acp)
October 1, 2018 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC EXHIBITS by Katecho, Inc., Surmasis Pharmaceutical, Inc. Exhibit 16 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19)(Penick, Bridget)
October 1, 2018 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC EXHIBITS by Katecho, Inc., Surmasis Pharmaceutical, Inc. Exhibit 15 (Penick, Bridget)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing Day 2 on #3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Evidentiary Hearing. Day 2 of the Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2018 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 160- 1st Floor North before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 9/28/2018. (acp)
September 28, 2018 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger: Motion Hearing Day 1 held on 9/28/2018 re #3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Evidentiary Hearing filed by Katecho, Inc., Surmasis Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Court Reporter Terri Martin.) (time in court 3 hr 48 min) (acp) Modified on 10/1/2018 (acp).
September 28, 2018 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC EXHIBITS #3 by Continental Manufacturing Chemist, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X)(Johnson, Alexander) Modified on 9/28/2018 (bp).
September 28, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Evidentiary Hearing *Expedited Hearing Requested* MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Evidentiary Hearing *Expedited Hearing Requested* filed by Constance Collom, Continental Manufacturing Chemist, Inc., Aaron Summerkamp, Amanda Summerkamp. Replies due by 10/5/2018. (bp)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to file overlength brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 9/27/2018. (mlr)
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 Unresisted MOTION to file overlength brief by Constance Collom, Continental Manufacturing Chemist, Inc., Aaron Summerkamp, Amanda Summerkamp.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Joint Resistance to Motion for PI)(Jansen, Amanda)
September 26, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Continental Manufacturing Chemist, Inc..(Jansen, Amanda)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay A. Vaught on behalf of Constance Collom, Aaron Summerkamp, Amanda Summerkamp (Vaught, Lindsay)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on #3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Evidentiary Hearing. A motion hearing is set for 9/28/2018 at 01:00 PM in Des Moines - Room 160- 1st Floor North before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Defendants shall file any response to #3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction no later than 12:00 p.m. on 9/27/2018. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 9/25/2018. (hfh)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda G Jansen on behalf of Continental Manufacturing Chemist, Inc. (Jansen, Amanda)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James W White on behalf of Continental Manufacturing Chemist, Inc. (White, James)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander M Johnson on behalf of Continental Manufacturing Chemist, Inc. (Johnson, Alexander)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary R Fischer on behalf of Katecho, Inc. (Fischer, Gary)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Robert Underwood on behalf of Katecho, Inc., Surmasis Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Underwood, Brandon)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Katecho, Inc., Surmasis Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Constance Collom waiver served on 9/24/2018, answer due 11/23/2018; Aaron Summerkamp waiver served on 9/24/2018, answer due 11/23/2018; Amanda Summerkamp waiver served on 9/24/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Penick, Bridget)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Evidentiary Hearing *Expedited Hearing Requested* by Katecho, Inc., Surmasis Pharmaceutical, Inc..Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Penick, Bridget)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Katecho, Inc., Surmasis Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Continental Manufacturing Chemist, Inc. waiver served on 9/24/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Penick, Bridget)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3604255., filed by Katecho, Inc., Surmasis Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/20/2018. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Penick, Bridget)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katecho, Inc. et al v. Continental Manufacturing Chemist, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Summerkamp
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Manufacturing Chemist, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander M Johnson
Represented By: Amanda G Jansen
Represented By: James W White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constance Collom
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Summerkamp
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Surmasis Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Bridget R Penick
Represented By: Brandon Robert Underwood
Represented By: Gary R Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katecho, Inc.
Represented By: Bridget R Penick
Represented By: Brandon Robert Underwood
Represented By: Gary R Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?