Fairfax v. Peitz

Plaintiff: Larry Fairfax
Defendant: Nicholas Peitz
Interested Party: William A Hill
Case Number: 4:2018cv00343
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: Iowa Southern District Court
0 Judge: Helen C Adams
1 Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2018 7 SUPPLEMENTAL by Larry Fairfax re #1 Complaint. Updated Plaintiff's address to Fort Dodge Correctional Facility. (slg)
November 5, 2018 6 CERTIFICATION OF INMATE ACCOUNT AND ASSETS by Larry Fairfax. (kjw)
November 5, 2018 5 SUPPLEMENTAL by Larry Fairfax re #1 Complaint. (kjw)
October 17, 2018 4 AFFIDAVIT filed by Larry Fairfax. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (kjw)
October 10, 2018 3 Featured Case PRESCREENING ORDER: The Court directs Plaintiff to amend his complaint and provide a completed Form C by no later than November 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 10/10/2018. (r) Paper copy of order mailed this date to Larry Fairfax #6036648 MT. PLEASANT CORRECTIONAL FACILITY 1200 East Washington Street Mt. Pleasant, IA 52641
October 9, 2018 Judge Stephanie M. Rose added. Senior Judge James E. Gritzner no longer assigned to case. (don)
October 9, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry Fairfax. (don)
October 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Nicholas Peitz, filed by Larry Fairfax. (don)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fairfax v. Peitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Peitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: William A Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Fairfax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?