United States of America v. Huff et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Area 15 Regional Planning Commission, Iowa Finance Authority and Todd Huff
Case Number: 4:2018cv00344
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: Iowa Southern District Court
0 Judge: Celeste F Bremer
1 Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated per pleading 5 . (bp)
November 28, 2018 5 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 11/28/2018. (jhn)
November 27, 2018 4 MOTION to Dismiss by United States of America. Responses due by 12/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Purdy, William)
November 5, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Marie Willits on behalf of Iowa Finance Authority (Willits, Emily)
November 5, 2018 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Iowa Finance Authority.(Willits, Emily)
October 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/8/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Purdy, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Huff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Area 15 Regional Planning Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa Finance Authority
Represented By: Emily Marie Willits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William C Purdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?