Hernandez v. Walmart Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Maria Hernandez
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00345
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: Iowa Southern District Court
0 Judge: Stephen B Jackson
1 Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2018 6 Featured Case TEXT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR CLOSING DOCUMENTS: The court has been notified this case has settled. Consequently, the scheduling conference will be cancelled and removed from the court's calendar. The parties shall file closing documents for the case by December 31, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/30/2018. (jeb)
November 30, 2018 5 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Weston, Benjamin)
November 29, 2018 4 Featured Case TEXT ORDER RESETTING TIME FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Due to changes to the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference set for December 4, 2018, in the Des Moines Courthouse shall begin at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/29/2018. (jeb)
November 13, 2018 3 Featured Case TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference shall be held on December 4, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. in the United States Courthouse in Des Moines, Iowa, before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by November 29, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/13/2018. (jeb)
November 1, 2018 2 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Walmart Stores, Inc..(Weston, Benjamin)
October 15, 2018 Set Deadline: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for Defendant 11/15/2018. Local Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Packet emailed to Defendant's counsel. (dmh)
October 11, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Stores, Inc. from Polk County District Court, case number LACL141705. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3619691., filed by Walmart Stores, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81.A Statement)(Weston, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Walmart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Hernandez
Represented By: Ken A Winjum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?