Humble v. Client Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Cathy Humble
Defendant: Client Services, Inc. and Capital One Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00347
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Iowa Southern District Court
0 Judge: Stephen B Jackson
1 Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2018 13 Featured Case TEXT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR CLOSING DOCUMENTS: The parties have filed a Notice of Settlement #12 . Consequently, the scheduling conference will be cancelled and removed from the court's calendar. The parties shall file closing documents for the case by January 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/29/2018. (jeb)
November 28, 2018 12 NOTICE of Settlement by Cathy Humble (Marks, Samuel)
November 14, 2018 11 Featured Case TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on December 4, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by November 29, 2018. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/14/2018. (jeb)
November 13, 2018 10 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Capital One Services, LLC. (Stromquist, Matthew)
November 9, 2018 9 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Client Services, Inc.. (Malone, Robbie)
November 2, 2018 8 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Capital One Services, LLC.(Stromquist, Matthew)
October 24, 2018 7 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robbie Malone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 10/24/2018. (kjw)
October 23, 2018 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3630214 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Client Services, Inc.. (Malone, Robbie)
October 18, 2018 5 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting #4 Defendant Capital One Services, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. As requested, defendant Capital One Services, LLC shall have until November 2, 2018, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/18/2018. (jeb)
October 17, 2018 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (UNOPPOSED) by Capital One Services, LLC.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Stromquist, Matthew)
October 15, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 11/13/2018. (kmc)
October 15, 2018 3 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew O. Stromquist. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 10/15/2018. (kjw)
October 15, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3622438 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Capital One Services, LLC. (Stromquist, Matthew)
October 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Client Services, Inc. from Iowa District Court of Marion County, case number SCSC030873. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3621141., filed by Client Services, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Records and Local Rule 81 Information, #3 Exhibit B - Capital One Consent to Removal)(Frost, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humble v. Client Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Client Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Frost
Represented By: Robbie L. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Services, LLC
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Matthew O Stromquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Humble
Represented By: Samuel Z Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?