Lajeunesse v. Chambers et al

Plaintiff: Michael A. Lajeunesse
Defendant: Megan Anne Chambers and KCCI News Station
Case Number: 4:2018cv00348
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Iowa Southern District Court
0 Judge: Robert W Pratt
1 Judge: Ross A Walters(R)
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2018 11 Letter from Plaintiff addressed to Judge Jarvey. (slg)
December 10, 2018 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL (paperwork received at the 8th Circuit on 12-6-18) as to #4 Initial Review Order, #5 Judgment by Michael A. Lajeunesse. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Circuit) (slg)
November 1, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER denying #6 Motion Additional information in support of complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 11/1/2018. (don)
October 31, 2018 7 NOTICE: supporting documents to Complaint by Michael A. Lajeunesse (slg)
October 26, 2018 6 MOTION/Declaration Supporting Complaint by Michael A. Lajeunesse.Motions referred to Ross A Walters(R). Responses due by 11/9/2018. (kjw)
October 24, 2018 5 JUDGMENT in favor of KCCI News Station, Megan Anne Chambers against Michael A. Lajeunesse. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 10/24/2018. (don)
October 23, 2018 4 Featured Case INITIAL REVIEW ORDER re 2 Granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael A. Lajeunesse, 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel is Moot filed by Michael A. Lajeunesse Complaint is dismissed. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 10/23/2018. (don)
October 18, 2018 3 TEXT MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael A. Lajeunesse. See entry #1 . Motions referred to Ross A Walters(R). Responses due by 11/1/2018. (kjw)
October 12, 2018 2 TEXT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael A. Lajeunesse. (don)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Megan Anne Chambers, KCCI News Station, filed by Michael A. Lajeunesse. (Attachments: #1 requesting copy) (don)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lajeunesse v. Chambers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Anne Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KCCI News Station
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Lajeunesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?