Advance Trust & Life Escrow Services, LTA v. North American Company for Life and Health Insurance
Plaintiff: Advance Trust & Life Escrow Services, LTA
Defendant: North American Company for Life and Health Insurance
Case Number: 4:2018cv00368
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Celeste F Bremer
2 Judge: James E Gritzner
3 Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 19 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 1/11/2019. (Dee, Michael)
December 27, 2018 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William H. Higgins. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/27/2018. (slg)
December 26, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3684856 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Dee, Michael)
December 26, 2018 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Dee, Michael)
December 26, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Dee on behalf of North American Company for Life and Health Insurance (Dee, Michael)
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael Brightman. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/30/2018. (kjw)
November 30, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3664177 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Advance Trust & Life Escrow Services, LTA. (Brightman, Michael)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Glenn C. Bridgman. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/16/2018. (kjw)
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3651434 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Advance Trust & Life Escrow Services, LTA. (Bridgman, Glenn)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Advance Trust & Life Escrow Services, LTA; North American Company for Life and Health Insurance waiver served on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Pogge, R)
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven G. Sklaver. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/6/2018. (kjw)
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3643818 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Advance Trust & Life Escrow Services, LTA. (Sklaver, Steven)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Seth Ard. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/6/2018. (kjw)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3641814 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Advance Trust & Life Escrow Services, LTA. (Ard, Seth)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ryan Kirkpatrick. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/1/2018. (kjw)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3638373 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Advance Trust & Life Escrow Services, LTA. (Kirkpatrick, Ryan)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel regarding related case 4-16-cv-140. (kjw)
October 31, 2018 Judge Stephanie M. Rose and Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer and Senior Judge James E. Gritzner no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Advance Trust & Life Escrow Services, LTA. (Pogge, R)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against North American Company for Life and Health Insurance Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3636544., filed by ADVANCE TRUST & LIFE ESCROW SERVICES LTA. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/28/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/28/2019.(Pogge, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advance Trust & Life Escrow Services, LTA v. North American Company for Life and Health Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Company for Life and Health Insurance
Represented By: Michael A Dee
Represented By: William H. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advance Trust & Life Escrow Services, LTA
Represented By: R Ronald Pogge
Represented By: Seth Ard
Represented By: Ryan C Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Steven G Sklaver
Represented By: Robin G Maxon
Represented By: Glenn C Bridgman
Represented By: Michael Brightman
Represented By: Ryan C. Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Steven G. Sklaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?