Teter v. Travelers Indemnity Company

Plaintiff: James M Teter, Jr.
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv00372
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
0 Judge: Stephen B Jackson
1 Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 REPLY Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Resistance to Motion for Remand re #3 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Fifth Judicial District in and for Polk County filed by James M Teter, Jr.(Neal, James)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Fifth Judicial District in and for Polk County filed by Travelers Indemnity Company. Replies due by 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letters Testamentary)(Clausen, Timothy)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Fifth Judicial District in and for Polk County by James M Teter, Jr. Responses due by 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Brief in Support of Motion for Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-4)(Neal, James)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Clausen, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 Set Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 11/30/2018. (vr)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Indemnity Company from Polk, case number LACL141889. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3636846., filed by Travelers Indemnity Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clausen, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teter v. Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Timothy A Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M Teter, Jr.
Represented By: James Neal
Represented By: James Benjamin Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?