Shelburn v. Iowa Correctional Institution for Women et al

Plaintiff: Catricia Shelburn
Defendant: Kerri Freidhof, Rachel McFarland, Eric Rankin, Angie Hutchkins and Iowa Correctional Institution for Women
Interested Party: William A Hill
Case Number: 4:2018cv00435
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
0 Judge: Celeste F Bremer
1 Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Catricia Shelburn. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account) (slg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Judgment, #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Catricia Shelburn. (slg)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 JUDGMENT in favor of Iowa Correctional Institution for Women, Angie Hutchkins, Eric Rankin, Kerri Freidhof, Rachel McFarland against Catricia Shelburn. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 11/15/2018. (kjw)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing case.Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 11/14/2018. (ptb)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Catricia Shelburn. (Attachments: #1 Form C) (slg)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kerri Freidhof, Angie Hutchkins, Iowa Correctional Institution for Women, Rachel McFarland, Eric Rankin, filed by Catricia Shelburn. (slg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelburn v. Iowa Correctional Institution for Women et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerri Freidhof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Hutchkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa Correctional Institution for Women
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catricia Shelburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: William A Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?