Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company v. Phoenix C & D Recycling, Inc.; et al.

Plaintiff: Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Phoenix C & D Recycling, Inc. and R & A Properties, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00443
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
0 Judge: Stephen B Jackson
1 Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY to Hallmark's Brief re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Phoenix C & D Recycling, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
December 18, 2018 Set Deadline: Replies due on the Motion to Dismiss #3 by 12/26/2018. (bp)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 BRIEF in Opposition by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Thrall, Michael) Modified on 12/18/2018 (bp).
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Ryan Hutchinson on behalf of Phoenix C & D Recycling, Inc. (Hutchinson, Jordan)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stephen V. Kovarik. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 12/10/2018. (kjw)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3670670 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. (Kovarik, Stephen)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rebecca R. Weinreich. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 12/7/2018. (kjw)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3670568 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. (Weinreich, Rebecca)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Phoenix C & D Recycling, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Phoenix C & D Recycling, Inc. Responses due by 12/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Abstain and Dismiss, #2 Affidavit of Michael S. Jones in Support of Motion to Abstain and Dismiss). (Jones, Michael)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. (Thrall, Michael)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants,Filing fee paid in the amount of $400, receipt number 0863-3648755., filed by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 2/11/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Thrall, Michael) Modified on 11/13/2018, added payment information (kjw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company v. Phoenix C & D Recycling, Inc.; et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael W Thrall
Represented By: Rebecca R. Weinreich
Represented By: Stephen V. Kovarik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix C & D Recycling, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Ryan Hutchinson
Represented By: Michael S Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & A Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?