Mator v. Five Star Quality Care-Iowa, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joyce Mator
Defendant: Five Star Quality Care-Iowa, Inc., d/b/a Union Park Health Services, a corporation and Five Star Quality Care-Iowa, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00447
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per Order #7 . (sjc)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Submitting Matter to Binding Arbitration and Dismissing Case. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 1/11/2019. (hfh)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of Dismissal in Favor of Mandatory Arbitration by Five Star Quality Care-Iowa, Inc.. (Millsap, Sarah)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File responsive pleading to and including December 21, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 12/18/2018. (mlr)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Uncontested Second Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Five Star Quality Care-Iowa, Inc..Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 12/31/2018. (Millsap, Sarah)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Five Star Quality Care-Iowa, Inc. answer due 12/21/2018. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 11/21/2018. (mlr)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Five Star Quality Care-Iowa, Inc..Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Millsap, Sarah)
November 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 12/19/2018. Corporate disclosure packet emailed to counsel. (sjc)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Five Star Quality Care-Iowa, Inc., d/b/a Union Park Health Services, a corporation from In the Iowa District Court in and for Polk County, Iowa, case number LACL141888. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3652868., filed by Five Star Quality Care-Iowa, Inc., d/b/a Union Park Health Services, a corporation. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Millsap, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mator v. Five Star Quality Care-Iowa, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Star Quality Care-Iowa, Inc., d/b/a Union Park Health Services, a corporation
Represented By: Sarah J. Millsap
Represented By: Catherine A. Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Star Quality Care-Iowa, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah J. Millsap
Represented By: Catherine A. Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Mator
Represented By: Marc A Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?