Gardner v. Walmart Inc.
Defendant: Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Transportation LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Petitioner: Daniel J. Gardner
Case Number: 4:2018cv00450
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. An In-Person Scheduling Conference shall be held on 1/29/2019 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 1/24/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/21/2018. (imk)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Transportation LLC.(Goldsmith, Mark)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark J. Goldsmith. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/4/2018. (kjw)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3666155 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Transportation LLC. (Guttau-Fox, Heidi)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Transportation LLC. (Guttau-Fox, Heidi)
November 27, 2018 Set Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 12/27/2018. (vr)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant may have to and including 12/21/2018 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/26/2018. (k)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Walmart Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Guttau-Fox, Heidi)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc. from IOWA DISTRICT COURT IN AND FOR POLK COUNTY, case number LACL142666. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3656494., filed by Walmart Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Guttau-Fox, Heidi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Heidi A Guttau-Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Transportation LLC
Represented By: Heidi A Guttau-Fox
Represented By: Mark J. Goldsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Heidi A Guttau-Fox
Represented By: Mark J. Goldsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Heidi A Guttau-Fox
Represented By: Mark J. Goldsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel J. Gardner
Represented By: Patrick D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?