Shields-Perrin v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Quashonda Shields-Perrin
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00456
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Nass, Mitchell)
December 21, 2018 Set Deadline: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for Defendant 1/21/2019. Corporate disclosure packet emailed to defense counsel. (dmh)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Nass, Mitchell)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Giudicessi on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Giudicessi, Michael)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell Garrett Nass on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Nass, Mitchell)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. waiver served on 12/4/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (Nass, Mitchell)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3661452., filed by Quashonda Shields-Perrin. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 2/26/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/26/2019.(Bullock, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shields-Perrin v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Mitchell Garrett Nass
Represented By: Michael A Giudicessi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quashonda Shields-Perrin
Represented By: Thomas James Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?