Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota v. XPO Logistics, Inc.

Plaintiff: Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota
Defendant: XPO Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00459
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Iowa Southern District Court
0 Judge: Stephen B Jackson
1 Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order 15 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/25/2019. (jeb)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order 14 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Jury Trial set for 6/1/2020 9:00 AM, or as soon thereafter as it can be reached for trial, in Des Moines Courthouse before Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle. Estimated length 4 days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2020 1:30 PM in Des Moines Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Initial Disclosures due by 2/7/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 3/18/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/18/2019. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 4/18/2019. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 6/18/2019. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 7/18/2019. Discovery Deadline 9/18/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadline 10/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/25/2019. (jeb)
January 23, 2019 13 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/23/2019. Attorneys Jeffrey Zielinski & Sean OBrien appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Dennis Ogden appeared for defendant. Scheduling order to be entered. Total Court Time: 15 minutes. (jeb)
January 18, 2019 12 Errata re #11 Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan. (Zielinski, Jeffrey)
January 18, 2019 11 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Zielinski, Jeffrey)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kenneth Grear. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 1/14/2019. (slg)
January 11, 2019 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3697907 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota. (Grear, Kenneth)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order 8 TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on January 23, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by no later than January 18, 2019. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/8/2019. (jeb)
January 7, 2019 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by XPO Logistics, Inc..(Ogden, Dennis)
December 27, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota. XPO Logistics, Inc. served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. (Zielinski, Jeffrey)
December 26, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota re #1 Complaint, Summons served December 13, 2018 (Zielinski, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey M. Zielinski. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 12/20/2018. (slg)
December 20, 2018 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3681805 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota. (Zielinski, Jeffrey)
December 17, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota. (OBrien, Sean)
December 7, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 1/7/2019. Summons and 7.1 Packet emailed to counsel. (sjc)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against XPO Logistics, Inc. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3668860., filed by Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 3/6/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/6/2019.(OBrien, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota v. XPO Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis P Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota
Represented By: Sean M OBrien
Represented By: Jeffrey M Zielinski
Represented By: Kenneth B. Grear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?