Foster v. Integrity Mutual Insurance Co.

Plaintiff: Brian Foster
Defendant: Integrity Mutual Insurance Co. and Integrity Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv00469
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
0 Judge: Celeste F Bremer
1 Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Integrity Mutual Insurance Company. (Richards, Michael)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rodger L. Eckelberry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 1/4/2019. (slg)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3689969 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Integrity Mutual Insurance Co.. (Eckelberry, Rodger)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses by Integrity Mutual Insurance Co..(Richards, Michael)
December 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 1/10/2019. Emailed packet to defense counsel. (don)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Integrity Mutual Insurance Co. Defendant shall move or plead by 1/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 12/20/2018. (krp)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Integrity Mutual Insurance Co..Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Enlarge Time to Move or Plead)(Richards, Michael)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81(a) by Integrity Mutual Insurance Co.. (Richards, Michael)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Integrity Mutual Insurance Co. from Polk County, case number LACL142868. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3680798., filed by Integrity Mutual Insurance Co.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Original Notice & Petition, #2 Exhibit B, Acceptance of Service, #3 Exhibit C, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Richards, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Integrity Mutual Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrity Mutual Insurance Co.
Represented By: Michael C. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrity Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C. Richards
Represented By: Rodger L Eckelberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Foster
Represented By: James H Cook
Represented By: Erich Dennis Priebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?