Luther Care Services et al v. J.F. Ahern Co. et al
Plaintiff: Luther Care Services d/b/a Luther Park Community and Luther Care Services
3Rd Party Plaintiff: J.F. Ahern Co.
3Rd Party Defendant: Luther Park Apartments Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00473
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 15 Errata re #14 Notice of Appearance filed by Luther Park Apartments Inc.. (Watson, David)
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by David Gordon Watson on behalf of Luther Park Apartments Inc. (Watson, David)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER CANCELING ALL DEADLINES AND HEARINGS AND FOR CLOSING DOCUMENTS. Dismissal Papers due by 2/28/2019. See order for other particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/29/2019. (imk)
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Scheduling Conference originally set for 1/30/2019 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse is continued to 1/31/2019 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/28/2019. (imk)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Burian, Philip)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Luther Care Services, Luther Park Apartments Inc.. (Watson, David)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Watson. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/9/2019. (slg)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3694289 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Luther Care Services, Luther Park Apartments Inc.. (Watson, David)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary J Shea on behalf of Luther Care Services (Shea, Gary)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. An In-Person Scheduling Conference shall be held on 1/30/2019 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 1/25/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/31/2018. (imk)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by J.F. Ahern Co.. (Burian, Philip)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Luther Park Apartments Inc., COUNTERCLAIM & Jury Demand against Luther Park Apartments Inc. by J.F. Ahern Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Burian, Philip)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Errata L.R. 81 Filing re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by J.F. Ahern Co.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Filings)(Burian, Philip)
December 27, 2018 Set Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 1/17/2019. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 1/17/2019. (rmj)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 PUBLIC DOCKET ANNOTATION: It appears Local Rule 7 applies in this case. Attached is this Court's 7.1 packet. Deadlines are set accordingly by the Clerk's Office. (rmj).
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by J.F. Ahern Co. from Polk, case number LACL143049. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3684915., filed by J.F. Ahern Co.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burian, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luther Care Services et al v. J.F. Ahern Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: J.F. Ahern Co.
Represented By: Philip A Burian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luther Care Services d/b/a Luther Park Community
Represented By: Gary J Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luther Care Services
Represented By: Gary J Shea
Represented By: David Gordon Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Luther Park Apartments Inc.
Represented By: David Gordon Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?