Koltiska, et al v. Integrity Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Kade Koltiska and Rhonda Koltiska
Defendant: Integrity Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv00483
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
0 Judge: Celeste F Bremer
1 Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rodger L. Eckelberry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 1/16/2019. (slg)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Integrity Mutual Insurance Company. (Eckelberry, Rodger)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Integrity Mutual Insurance Company. (Richards, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses by Integrity Mutual Insurance Company.(Richards, Michael)
January 2, 2019 Set Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 1/23/2019. Local Rule 7.1 packet e-mailed to defense attorney. (rmj)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81(a) by Integrity Mutual Insurance Company. (Richards, Michael)
December 31, 2018 Chief Judge John A. Jarvey and Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer added. Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr and Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt no longer assigned to case. (don)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Integrity Mutual Insurance Company from Polk County, case number LACL143113. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3687224., filed by Integrity Mutual Insurance Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Original Notice and Petition, #2 Exhibit B-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Richards, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koltiska, et al v. Integrity Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrity Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C. Richards
Represented By: Rodger L Eckelberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kade Koltiska
Represented By: Nicholas C. Rowley
Represented By: Dominic F Pechota
Represented By: Matthew James Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Koltiska
Represented By: Nicholas C. Rowley
Represented By: Dominic F Pechota
Represented By: Matthew James Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?