Olson et al v. Eurofins Environment Testing US Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Paul Olson and Andrea Olson
Defendant: Eurofins Environment TEsting US Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00026
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Eurofins Environment Testing US Holdings, Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 4/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(McDermott, Matthew)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer. As requested, defendant Eurofins Environment Testing US Holdings, Inc. shall have until March 18, 2019, to file its answer to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 3/5/2019. (jeb)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Eurofins Environment Testing US Holdings, Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (McDermott, Matthew)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Olson. Eurofins Environment Testing US Holdings, Inc. served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. (Brennan, Scott)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Arthur D. Goldman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 2/5/2019. (kjw)
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: IAS400020857 Fee paid in the amount of $100.00 by Paul Olson.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 2/14/2019. (Brennan, Scott) Modified on 1/31/2019 added payment information(slg).
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (bp)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant, Eurofins Environment Testing US Holdings, Inc. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3710370., filed by Paul Olson. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 4/24/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 4/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C 2, (4) Exhibit D (5) Exhibit E(6) Exhibit F (Brennan, Scott) (don). Modified on 1/25/2019 Replaced exhibits to show exhibit letters and updated docket text per request of plaintiff counsel.(don). Modified on 1/28/2019 (bp correct parties).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olson et al v. Eurofins Environment Testing US Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Olson
Represented By: Lucas B. Draisey
Represented By: Scott M Brennan
Represented By: Arthur David Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Olson
Represented By: Lucas B. Draisey
Represented By: Scott M Brennan
Represented By: Arthur David Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eurofins Environment TEsting US Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew C McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?