Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa v. BASF Corporation
Plaintiff: Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00033
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See order for particulars. Status Conference set for 7/23/2019 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 9/26/2019 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 11/25/2019 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 1/23/2020 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 3/23/2020 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 5/26/2020 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/26/2019. (imk)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/26/2019. (imk)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER adopting #14 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 5/1/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 5/21/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/21/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 6/21/2019. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 8/21/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 9/23/2019. Discovery Deadline 1/21/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 2/21/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2020 10:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Bench Trial set for 8/31/2020 09:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Chief Judge John A. Jarvey. Estimated length of five days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/26/2019. (imk)
March 26, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 3/26/2019. Attorney Brant Kahler appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Stephen Eckley appeared for defendant. Status of case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 15 minutes. (imk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Merrill, Benjamin)
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #10 Answer to Complaint STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER WITHDRAWING JURY DEMAND by BASF Corporation. (Eckley, Stephen)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. An In-Person Scheduling Conference shall be held on 3/26/2019 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 3/21/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 2/28/2019. (imk)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Callanan on behalf of BASF Corporation (Callanan, Matthew)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand by BASF Corporation.(Eckley, Stephen)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa. (Kahler, Brant)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 ***See entry #6 for image***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa. BASF Corporation served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. Refiled event to set Answer due deadline. (don)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT (Redacted) against BASF Corporation, filed by Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/8/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/8/2019.(Kahler, Brant)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa. (Kahler, Brant)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: ORDER TO FILE REDACTED COMPLAINT. In addition to their sealed Complaint #3 , Plaintiff shall file an unsealed, redacted Complaint by 2/8/19. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 2/1/2019. (imk)
February 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Initiating event not used to set deadlines. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 2/19/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 4/29/2019. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 4/29/2019. (don)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 LR 7.1 Packet) (bp)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 Sealed Document Complaint by Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number IAS400020858 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Support Agreement)(Kahler, Brant) Modified on 1/31/2019, added payment information (kjw).
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Plaintiff may file the Complaint and supporting attachments under seal. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/29/2019. (imk)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File under Seal by Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 2/12/2019. (Kahler, Brant)
January 29, 2019 Chief Judge John A. Jarvey and Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. (kjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa v. BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa
Represented By: Benjamin R. Merrill
Represented By: Thomas D. Story
Represented By: Brant D. Kahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Stephen R Eckley
Represented By: Matthew David Callanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?