Graves v. Bayer Pharma AG et al

Plaintiff: Beverly Graves
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Bayer Corporation and Bayer Pharma AG
Case Number: 4:2019cv00042
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1407pl
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 Certified Conditional Transfer Order 184 by Clerk's Office, Eastern District of Louisiana. (slg)
February 21, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. Electronically sent to Eastern District of Louisiana. (slg)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Conditional Transfer Order MDL No. 2592 for Eastern District of Louisiana. (slg)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-184) Finalized on 2/14/19. Please see pleading (3 in IAS/4:19-cv-00042, 1496 in MDL No. 2592).As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the E.D. Louisiana for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 2/14/2019. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2592, IAS/4:19-cv-00042 (DP) (slg)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 all Defendants unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to and including March 11, 2019, to move or plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 2/6/2019. (mlr)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Hardeman, Kimberly)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to MDL Panel regarding Potential Tag-Along Action. Paperwork emailed to MDL Panel. (kjw)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Pharma AG. (Hardeman, Kimberly)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bayer Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development from Marion County, case number LACV096890. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3720784., filed by Bayer Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Hardeman, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graves v. Bayer Pharma AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly K Hardeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly K Hardeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Kimberly K Hardeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: Kimberly K Hardeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Pharma AG
Represented By: Kimberly K Hardeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Graves
Represented By: Molly Marie Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?