Gillespie v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.

Plaintiff: Donna Gillespie
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00043
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: John A Jarvey
Referring Judge: Ross A Walters(R)
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332pa
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY DEFENDANT DELTA AIR LINES, INC.S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESISTANCE TO DELTAS MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc..(Torpey, Scott)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Donna Gillespie. Replies due by 3/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Resistance to Motion to Dismiss)(Duff, Thomas)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Plaintiffs unresisted motion for extension of time to resist Defendants motion to dismiss #9 . Plaintiff may have to and including 3/13/2019 to respond to the motion to dismiss, and Defendant may have to an including 3/25/2019 for reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 2/21/2019. (k)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance to Motion to Dismiss by Donna Gillespie.Motions referred to Ross A Walters(R). Responses due by 3/7/2019. (Duff, Thomas)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. Responses due by 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Torpey, Scott)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Torpey, Scott)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 2/27/2019. (slg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. O'Connell on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc. (O'Connell, Timothy)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Raymond Torpey on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Torpey, Scott)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Timothy J. O'Connell; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott R. Torpey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 2/7/2019. (slg)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3724110 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Callanan, Matthew)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3724084 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Callanan, Matthew)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Delta Air Lines, Inc. from Polk County Iowa, case number LACL143194. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3723903., filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Rule 81.1 Certificate, #5 State Court Filings)(Callanan, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillespie v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Gillespie
Represented By: Thomas J Duff
Represented By: Jim T. Duff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew David Callanan
Represented By: Scott Raymond Torpey
Represented By: Timothy J. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?