Bellah v. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Janel Bellah
Defendant: Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. and The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00044
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company. (Davidson, Steven)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Davidson, Steven)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc..(Davidson, Steven)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Quentin Stoltze on behalf of Janel Bellah (Stoltze, John)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven D. Davidson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 2/12/2019. (slg)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendants shall file the Answer by March 6, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 2/12/2019. (krp)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3731087 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Davidson, Steven)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc..Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Guttau-Fox, Heidi)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 3/8/2019. (kmc)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number LACL143393. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3724169., filed by Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Petition, #2 Exhibit B -Notice of Removal State, #3 Exhibit C-L.R. 81 Statement re Notice of Removal)(Guttau-Fox, Heidi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellah v. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Heidi A Guttau-Fox
Represented By: Steven D Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Heidi A Guttau-Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Heidi A Guttau-Fox
Represented By: Steven D Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janel Bellah
Represented By: Bruce H Stoltze
Represented By: John Quentin Stoltze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?