Balderas v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Fransicsa Balderas
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00045
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fransicsa Balderas. United States of America served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Galligan, Brian)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Note: Counsel should download the attached summons. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons. (slg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3728874., filed by Fransicsa Balderas. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/13/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/13/2019.(Galligan, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balderas v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fransicsa Balderas
Represented By: Brian P Galligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?