Austin v. Home Depot USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kennard Lee Austin
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00046
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983vp
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See order for more particulars. Status Conference set for 6/25/2019 09:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 8/23/2019 09:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 10/28/2019 09:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 12/18/2019 09:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 2/24/2020 09:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 4/29/2020 09:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/25/2019. (imk)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/25/2019. (imk)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER adopting #8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 3/29/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 4/19/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/19/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 5/24/2019. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 7/26/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 8/23/2019. Discovery Deadline 10/25/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadline 11/22/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/19/2020 10:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 7/13/2020 09:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Estimated length of four days.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/25/2019. (imk)
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 3/25/2019. Attorney Colin Murphy appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Benjamin Michael Weston appeared for defendant. Status of case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 12 minutes. (imk)
March 6, 2019 Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams as referral Judge and Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle no longer assigned to case. (slg)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER. Upon the consent of the parties, and in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. section 636 (c), the parties waive their right to proceed before a Judge of the United States District Court and consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct any and all further proceedings and order the entry of judgment in this case. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 3/5/2019. (alb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Weston, Benjamin)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 Errata re #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Kennard Lee Austin. (Murphy, Colin)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin C Murphy on behalf of Kennard Lee Austin (Murphy, Colin)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Scheduling Conference shall be held on 3/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 3/20/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 2/21/2019. (imk)
February 18, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Weston, Benjamin)
February 18, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended), Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Home Depot USA, Inc..(Weston, Benjamin)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 3/4/2019. (slg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot USA, Inc. from Polk County District Court, case number LACL142828. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3729512., filed by Home Depot USA, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81.A Statement)(Weston, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin v. Home Depot USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennard Lee Austin
Represented By: Colin C Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Weston
Represented By: Allyson Fawcett Aden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?