CM Life Insurance Company v. Joseph et al
Plaintiff: CM Life Insurance Company and C.M. Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Anna Joseph, Tricia Joseph Peden, Jennifer Bailliere Joseph, Burton M Joseph III, Debra Joseph and Burton M. Joseph, III
Case Number: 4:2019cv00048
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint for Interpleader by Jennifer Bailliere Joseph, Debra Joseph, Tricia Joseph Peden.(Van Loon, Haley)
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas D. Story on behalf of Jennifer Bailliere Joseph, Debra Joseph, Tricia Joseph Peden (Story, Thomas)
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Haley R Van Loon on behalf of Jennifer Bailliere Joseph, Debra Joseph, Tricia Joseph Peden (Van Loon, Haley)
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by C.M. Life Insurance Company; Burton M. Joseph, III waiver served on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Craig, James)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by C.M. Life Insurance Company; Tricia Joseph Peden waiver served on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Craig, James)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by C.M. Life Insurance Company; Jennifer Bailliere Joseph waiver served on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Craig, James)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by C.M. Life Insurance Company; Debra Joseph waiver served on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Craig, James)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by C.M. Life Insurance Company. (Craig, James)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER to Service of Summons for Tricia Joseph Peden by C.M. Life Insurance Company. (Craig, James)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER to Service of Summons for Jennifer Baillere Joseph by C.M. Life Insurance Company. (Craig, James)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER to Service of Summons for Debra Joseph by C.M. Life Insurance Company. (Craig, James)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 3/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Packet) (don)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3730878., filed by CM Life Insurance Company. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/13/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/13/2019.(Craig, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CM Life Insurance Company v. Joseph et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CM Life Insurance Company
Represented By: James P Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.M. Life Insurance Company
Represented By: James P Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tricia Joseph Peden
Represented By: Haley R Van Loon
Represented By: Thomas D. Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Bailliere Joseph
Represented By: Haley R Van Loon
Represented By: Thomas D. Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burton M Joseph III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Joseph
Represented By: Haley R Van Loon
Represented By: Thomas D. Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burton M. Joseph, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?