Terrell v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Jennetta Terrell
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2019cv00053
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (slg)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 2/22/2019. (alb)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jennetta Terrell. (kjw)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Jennetta Terrell. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/16/2019. (kjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terrell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennetta Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?