Putco, Inc. v. Shenzhen Aurora Technology Co., Ltd.

Plaintiff: Putco, Inc.
Defendant: Shenzhen Aurora Technology Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00054
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: James E Gritzner
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
2 Judge: Ross A Walters(R)
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kevin K. Tung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 4/2/2019. (slg)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3782687 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Shenzhen Aurora Technology Co., Ltd.. (Conley, Joshua)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua James Conley on behalf of Shenzhen Aurora Technology Co., Ltd. (Conley, Joshua)
March 11, 2019 Senior Judge James E. Gritzner added. Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Putco, Inc.. (Johnson, R.)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Putco, Inc.; Shenzhen Aurora Technology Co., Ltd. waiver served on 2/20/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Johnson, R.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 3/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (slg)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (slg)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shenzhen Aurora Technology Co., Ltd. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3735895., filed by Putco, Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/16/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 9,995,473)(Johnson, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Putco, Inc. v. Shenzhen Aurora Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Putco, Inc.
Represented By: R Scott Johnson
Represented By: Nicholas Krob
Represented By: R. Scott Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Aurora Technology Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Joshua James Conley
Represented By: Kevin K. Tung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?