Schiller v. TPI Iowa, LLC
Plaintiff: Ranee Schiller
Defendant: TPI Iowa, LLC and TPI Iowa LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00084
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331fm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/10/2019. (jeb)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Jury Trial set to begin 9/14/2020 9:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse - Room 160 - before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger for estimated 5 days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2020 9:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse - Room 160 - before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Initial Disclosures due by 6/14/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 9/9/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/9/2019. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/11/2019. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 11/11/2019. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 12/11/2019. Discovery Deadline 1/17/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 2/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/10/2019. (jeb)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/9/2019. Attorneys Amy Beck & Madison Fiedler-Carlson appeared for plaintiff. Attorneys Emily Kolbe & Rebecca Reif appeared for defendant. Scheduling order to be entered. Total Court Time: 15 minutes. (jeb)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (jeb)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion for Protective Order. The court approves and will enter the proposed protective order submitted with the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (jeb)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Ranee Schiller.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Joint Proposed Protective Order)(Beck, Amy)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Beck, Amy)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on May 9, 2019, at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by May 6, 2019. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 4/30/2019. (jeb)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by TPI Iowa LLC. (Reif, Rebecca)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by TPI Iowa LLC.(Reif, Rebecca)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 4/10/2019. (slg)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Errata CORRECTED re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by TPI Iowa, LLC. (Kolbe, Emily)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TPI IOWA, LLC from Jasper, case number LCV121425. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3769057., filed by TPI IOWA, LLC. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 LR81A List on Removal)(Kolbe, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schiller v. TPI Iowa, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ranee Schiller
Represented By: Amy Rachelle Beck
Represented By: Madison Elizabeth Fiedler-Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPI Iowa, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca Elizabeth Reif
Represented By: Emily Kolbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPI Iowa LLC
Represented By: Rebecca Elizabeth Reif
Represented By: Emily Kolbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?