Kirkwood v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Kristina Marie Kirkwood
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00089
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: James E Gritzner
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/13/2019. (jeb)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Jury Trial set to begin 10/26/2020 9:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse, Room 265, before Senior Judge James E. Gritzner for estimated 5 days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2020 10:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Initial Disclosures due by 7/1/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 8/30/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/30/2019. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 11/29/2019. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 1/30/2020. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 2/28/2020. Discovery Deadline 3/31/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 4/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/13/2019. (jeb)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/12/2019. Scheduling order to be entered. Total Court Time: 15 minutes. (jeb)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on June 12, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/5/2019. (jeb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN Corrected. (Stoltze, Bruce)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER. The Text Order of Reference - Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge 8 is vacated. Signed by Senior Judge James E. Gritzner on 6/3/2019. (nlh)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting in part #9 Defendant's Motion for Corrected Scheduling Order. The parties shall file a new, corrected proposed scheduling order and discovery plan by June 6, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/3/2019. (jeb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 Unresisted MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Order, #7 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Cook, Guy)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ***VACATED, per entry 11 *** TEXT ORDER OF REFERENCE - CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This matter is hereby referred to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings and entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and the consent of the parties. Signed by Senior Judge James E. Gritzner on 6/3/2019. (nlh) Modified on 6/3/2019 (kjw).
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Stoltze, Bruce)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce H Stoltze on behalf of Kristina Marie Kirkwood (Stoltze, Bruce)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER & DISCOVERY PLAN. Joint proposed scheduling order and discovery plan due by May 31, 2019. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 4/30/2019. (jeb)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Zenor, Adam)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Zenor, Adam)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 4/15/2019. (slg)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Polk County, case number LACL142962. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3773928., filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1-Petition, #3 Exhibit 2-Original Notice, #4 Exhibit 3-Acceptance of Service, #5 Exhibit 4-Order Setting Deadline of Service)(Zenor, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirkwood v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Marie Kirkwood
Represented By: Bruce H Stoltze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Adam D. Zenor
Represented By: Guy R Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?