United States of America v. Four Firearms and Assorted Ammunition
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Four Firearms and Assorted Ammunition
Case Number: 4:2019cv00104
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Four firearms and assorted ammunition. (slg)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Entry in re All Defendants Clerk of Court by United States of America. Responses due by 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaumer, Craig)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint Declaration of Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Forfeiture Action - Advertisement Certification Report)(Gaumer, Craig)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint Verified in Rem (Gaumer, Craig)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America re #3 Writ Issued Executed Warrant of Arrest in Rem (Gaumer, Craig)
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 Arrest Warrant in Rem Issued as to Defendant property. (slg)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America. Responses due by 4/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaumer, Craig)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified in Rem against Four Firearms and Assorted Ammunition, filed by United States of America. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 6/27/2019.(Gaumer, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Four Firearms and Assorted Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Firearms and Assorted Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig P Gaumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?