Iowa Laborers' District Council Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. C. Cox Concrete, LLC

Plaintiff: Laborers' National Pension Fund, Iowa Laborers' Education and Training Fund and Iowa Laborers' District Council Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Defendant: C. Cox Concrete, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00105
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams as referral judge and Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt no longer assigned to case. (slg)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See order for more particulars. Status Conference set for 10/10/2019 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 12/9/2019 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 2/11/2020 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 4/10/2020 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/9/2019. (imk)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/9/2019. (imk)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER adopting #13 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 8/5/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 9/5/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/5/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/4/2019. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 12/4/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 1/3/2020. Discovery Deadline 2/5/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 3/5/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2020 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 460 - 4th Floor North before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 10/5/2020 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 460 - 4th Floor North before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Estimated length of three days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/9/2019. (imk)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #13 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE Joint Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 7/9/2019. (klw)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 7/9/2019. Attorney Brandon Wood appeared for plaintiffs. Attorney Luke Craven appeared for defendant. Status of case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 8 minutes. (imk)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE Joint Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan. (Amash, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Scheduling Conference shall be held on 7/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. Counsel outside of Des Moines may attend telephonically. If they choose to do so, counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 7/5/2019.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/7/2019. (imk)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by C. Cox Concrete, LLC.(Craven, Samuel)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer is due 6/7/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/8/2019. (imk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by C. Cox Concrete, LLC.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Craven, Samuel)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Dean Stone on behalf of C. Cox Concrete, LLC (Stone, Jeffrey)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Luke Craven on behalf of C. Cox Concrete, LLC (Craven, Samuel)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brandon E. Wood. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/22/2019. (slg)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3800076 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Iowa Laborers' District Council Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Iowa Laborers' Education and Training Fund, Laborers' National Pension Fund. (Wood, Brandon)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Iowa Laborers' District Council Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Iowa Laborers' Education and Training Fund, Laborers' National Pension Fund. (Amash, Michael)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Iowa Laborers' District Council Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Iowa Laborers' Education and Training Fund, Laborers' National Pension Fund. C. Cox Concrete, LLC served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Amash, Michael)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (slg)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C. Cox Concrete, LLC Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3782785., filed by Iowa Laborers' District Council Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Iowa Laborers' Education and Training Fund, Laborers' National Pension Fund. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 7/1/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/1/2019.(Amash, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iowa Laborers' District Council Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. C. Cox Concrete, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Cox Concrete, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Stone
Represented By: Samuel Luke Craven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers' National Pension Fund
Represented By: Michael Elias Amash
Represented By: Brandon Eric Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iowa Laborers' Education and Training Fund
Represented By: Michael Elias Amash
Represented By: Brandon Eric Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iowa Laborers' District Council Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Michael Elias Amash
Represented By: Brandon Eric Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?