Connelly v. Favorite Healthcare Staffing, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Shasta Connelly
Defendant: Favorite Healthcare Staffing, Inc., Cathy Vollmer and Kathleen Perry
Case Number: 4:2019cv00107
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Referring Judge: Ross A Walters(R)
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. See #6 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. (kmc)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice - Joint, by Favorite Healthcare Staffing, Inc., Kathleen Perry, Cathy Vollmer. (DeVeney, Jeannie)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Closing Documents: Dismissal Papers due by 7/12/2019. See order for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 6/12/2019. (k)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Favorite Healthcare Staffing, Inc., Kathleen Perry, Cathy Vollmer.(DeVeney, Jeannie)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Favorite Healthcare Staffing, Inc.. (DeVeney, Jeannie)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Favorite Healthcare Staffing, Inc., Kathleen Perry, Cathy Vollmer re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to Plaintiff of Filing of Removal (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal)(DeVeney, Jeannie)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cathy Vollmer, Kathleen Perry, Favorite Healthcare Staffing, Inc. from Polk County District Court, case number LACL143801. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3782906., filed by Cathy Vollmer, Kathleen Perry, Favorite Healthcare Staffing, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeVeney, Jeannie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connelly v. Favorite Healthcare Staffing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Favorite Healthcare Staffing, Inc.
Represented By: Jeannie M DeVeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Vollmer
Represented By: Jeannie M DeVeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Perry
Represented By: Jeannie M DeVeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shasta Connelly
Represented By: Frank B Harty
Represented By: Katie Lynn Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?