Meyer v. Herndon et al

Plaintiff: Jason William Meyer and Justin Meyer
Defendant: Jason David Herndon, William McCarthy and Polk County Iowa
Case Number: 4:2019cv00109
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983vp
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. An In-Person Scheduling Conference shall be held on 7/22/2019 at 11:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/8/2019. (imk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Borland, Nathan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Justin Meyer. Replies due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Resistance to Motion to Dismiss)(Borland, Nathan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Nathan James Borland (Borland, Nathan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Plaintiff's Unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's response is due on or before 6/24/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/18/2019. (k)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance to Defendant McCarthy's Motion to Dismiss by Justin Meyer.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 7/1/2019. (Borland, Nathan)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by William McCarthy. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Bussanmas, Julie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Consent(s) by William McCarthy (Bussanmas, Julie)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Jason David Herndon.(Munro, Kenneth)
April 26, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Pl's Resistance to re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Request for Judicial Notice filed by Polk County Iowa. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Reply to Pl's Resistance to MTD and Req for Judicial Notice)(Bussanmas, Julie)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Justin Meyer; William McCarthy waiver served on 4/10/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Borland, Nathan)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Gavin on behalf of Polk County Iowa (Gavin, Meghan)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Request for Judicial Notice filed by Justin Meyer. Replies due by 4/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Resistance to Polk County's Motion to Dismiss)(Borland, Nathan)
April 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 7/2/2019 re Defendant William McCarthy. (kmc)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Request for Judicial Notice by Polk County Iowa. Responses due by 4/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support and Request for Judicial Notice)(Bussanmas, Julie)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Consent(s) by Jason David Herndon (Munro, Kenneth)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 Errata re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Polk County Iowa. (Bussanmas, Julie)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Polk County Iowa from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number LACL143864. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3784181., filed by Polk County Iowa. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Filings in Case LACL143864)(Bussanmas, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer v. Herndon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason David Herndon
Represented By: Kenneth R Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William McCarthy
Represented By: Julie Jean Bussanmas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polk County Iowa
Represented By: Julie Jean Bussanmas
Represented By: Meghan L. Gavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason William Meyer
Represented By: Brooke C Timmer
Represented By: Nathan James Borland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Meyer
Represented By: Brooke C Timmer
Represented By: Nathan James Borland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?