Regenexx, LLC v. Regenx Health LLC et al

Plaintiff: Regenexx, LLC
Defendant: Marshall Stein M.D., Regenx Health LLC, Regenx Health Labs LLC and Marshall Stein
Case Number: 4:2019cv00119
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #22 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Submitting Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan. The deadline for the parties to file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan under L.R. 16 shall be extended until further order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/19/2019. (jeb)
June 19, 2019 Filing 22 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Scheduling and Discovery Plan by Regenexx, LLC.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 7/3/2019. (Dee, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #19 MOTION to Transfer Case out of Southern District of Iowa filed by Regenx Health LLC, Regenx Health Labs LLC, Marshall Stein. Replies due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Regen-Based Marks, #2 Affidavit Verification of Table in Exhibit, #3 Affidavit Second Declaration of Defendant Marshall Stein, M.D., #4 Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Lawsuit)(Tripp, Karen)
June 3, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Regenexx, LLC. Replies due by 6/10/2019.(Dee, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Transfer Case out of Southern District of Iowa by Regenexx, LLC. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Dee, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Karen B. Tripp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 5/21/2019. (slg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C Riley on behalf of All Defendants (Riley, Peter)
May 20, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3824236 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Regenx Health LLC, Regenx Health Labs LLC, Marshall Stein. (Riley, Peter)
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 STATEMENT Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regenx Health LLC, Regenx Health Labs LLC, Marshall Stein. (Riley, Peter)
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Marshall Stein M.D. re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Regenx Health LLC, Regenx Health Labs LLC, Marshall Stein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Riley, Peter)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Regenx Health LLC, Regenx Health Labs LLC, Marshall Stein. Responses due by 6/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Riley, Peter)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Regenexx, LLC. (Dee, Michael)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Regenexx, LLC. (Dee, Michael)
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regenexx, LLC. Regenx Health LLC served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Dee, Michael) Modified on 5/13/2019 correction of served date 4/29/2019 and answer due date 5/20/2019. (kjw).
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regenexx, LLC. Marshall Stein served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Dee, Michael) Modified on 5/13/2019 correction of served date 4/29/2019 and answer due date 5/20/2019. (kjw).
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regenexx, LLC. Regenx Health Labs LLC served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Dee, Michael) Modified on 5/13/2019, correction of served date 4/29/2019 and answer due date 5/20/2019. (kjw).
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Regenexx, LLC. (Dee, Michael)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Regenexx, LLC. (Dee, Michael)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Regenexx, LLC. (Dee, Michael)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) See Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (kmc)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 5/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 7.1 Packet) (kmc)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Errata Exhibit 6 re #1 Copyright/Patent/Trademark Complaint, filed by Regenexx, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9)(Dee, Michael)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COPYRIGHT/PATENT/TRADEMARK COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3795121., filed by Regenexx, LLC. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 7/15/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Dee, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regenexx, LLC v. Regenx Health LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Stein M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regenx Health LLC
Represented By: Peter C Riley
Represented By: Karen Bryant Tripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regenx Health Labs LLC
Represented By: Peter C Riley
Represented By: Karen Bryant Tripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Stein
Represented By: Peter C Riley
Represented By: Karen Bryant Tripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regenexx, LLC
Represented By: Michael A Dee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?