Animal Legal Defense Fund et al v. Reynolds et al
Plaintiff: Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Bailing Out Benji, People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc. and Center for Food Safety
Defendant: Kimberly Reynolds, Drew B. Swanson and Thomas Miller
Case Number: 4:2019cv00124
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: James E Gritzner
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiffs shall file their resistance by July 19, 2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/25/2019. (imk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEF by Thomas Miller, Kimberly Reynolds, Drew B. Swanson re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (slg)
June 22, 2019 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Bailing Out Benji, Center for Food Safety, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement, People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 7/8/2019. (Strugar, Matthew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion to file overlength brief. Defendants may file their overlength brief. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/21/2019. (imk)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to file overlength brief by Thomas Miller, Kimberly Reynolds, Drew B. Swanson.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Motion to Dismiss)(Larson, Jacob)
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Thomas Miller, Kimberly Reynolds, Drew B. Swanson. Responses due by 7/5/2019. (Larson, Jacob)
May 13, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Bailing Out Benji, Center for Food Safety, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement, People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.. (Strugar, Matthew)
May 2, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc., Animal Legal Defense Fund, Center for Food Safety, Bailing Out Benji, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement; Drew B. Swanson waiver served on 4/22/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Bettis Austen, Rita)
May 2, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc., Animal Legal Defense Fund, Center for Food Safety, Bailing Out Benji, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement; Thomas Miller waiver served on 4/22/2019, answer due 6/21/2019; Kimberly Reynolds waiver served on 4/22/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Bettis Austen, Rita)
May 1, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew Liebman; granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Cristina Stella. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/1/2019. (kjw)
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3808181 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Animal Legal Defense Fund. (Stella, Cristina)
April 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3808170 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Animal Legal Defense Fund. (Liebman, Matthew)
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew Strugar. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/29/2019. (kjw)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3806322 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Bailing Out Benji, Center for Food Safety, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement, People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.. (Strugar, Matthew)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Justin Marceau. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/23/2019. (slg)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3801696 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Bailing Out Benji, Center for Food Safety, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement, People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.. (Marceau, Justin)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alan Chen. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/23/2019. (slg)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3801599 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Bailing Out Benji, Center for Food Safety, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement, People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.. (Chen, Alan)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kelsey Eberly; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Muraskin. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/23/2019. (slg)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3801332 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Bailing Out Benji, Center for Food Safety, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement, People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.. (Muraskin, David)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (slg)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3801145 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Bailing Out Benji, Center for Food Safety, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement, People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.. (Eberly, Kelsey)
April 22, 2019 Senior Judge James E. Gritzner and Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer and Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3799795., filed by People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc., Animal Legal Defense Fund, Center for Food Safety, Bailing Out Benji, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 7/22/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/22/2019.(Bettis Austen, Rita)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Animal Legal Defense Fund et al v. Reynolds et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement
Represented By: Cristina Rachel Stella
Represented By: Matthew Strugar
Represented By: Rita N. Bettis Austen
Represented By: Kelsey Rinehart Eberly
Represented By: David Samuel Muraskin
Represented By: Matthew Glen Liebman
Represented By: Alan K. Chen
Represented By: Justin F. Marceau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Animal Legal Defense Fund
Represented By: Cristina Rachel Stella
Represented By: Matthew Strugar
Represented By: Rita N. Bettis Austen
Represented By: Kelsey Rinehart Eberly
Represented By: David Samuel Muraskin
Represented By: Matthew Glen Liebman
Represented By: Alan K. Chen
Represented By: Justin F. Marceau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bailing Out Benji
Represented By: Cristina Rachel Stella
Represented By: Matthew Strugar
Represented By: Rita N. Bettis Austen
Represented By: Kelsey Rinehart Eberly
Represented By: David Samuel Muraskin
Represented By: Matthew Glen Liebman
Represented By: Alan K. Chen
Represented By: Justin F. Marceau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.
Represented By: Cristina Rachel Stella
Represented By: Matthew Strugar
Represented By: Rita N. Bettis Austen
Represented By: Kelsey Rinehart Eberly
Represented By: David Samuel Muraskin
Represented By: Matthew Glen Liebman
Represented By: Alan K. Chen
Represented By: Justin F. Marceau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Food Safety
Represented By: Cristina Rachel Stella
Represented By: Matthew Strugar
Represented By: Rita N. Bettis Austen
Represented By: Kelsey Rinehart Eberly
Represented By: David Samuel Muraskin
Represented By: Matthew Glen Liebman
Represented By: Alan K. Chen
Represented By: Justin F. Marceau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Reynolds
Represented By: Jacob John Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew B. Swanson
Represented By: Jacob John Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Miller
Represented By: Jacob John Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?