Kelly v. Des Moines University et al
Plaintiff: Alena Kelly
Defendant: Alicia Lynch, Kimberly Brown and Des Moines University
Case Number: 4:2019cv00133
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting #9 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 7/2/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 8/13/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/13/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 9/13/2019. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 11/13/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 12/13/2019. Discovery Deadline 2/13/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 3/13/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2020 10:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 9/14/2020 09:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Chief Judge John A. Jarvey. Estimated length of four days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/18/2019. (imk)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/18/2019. (imk)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See order for more particulars. Status Conference set for 9/23/2019 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 11/22/2019 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 1/22/2020 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 3/12/2020 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/18/2019. (imk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 6/18/2019. Attorneys Gary Dickey Jr. and Jason Bach appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Kelly R Baier appeared for defendants. Status of case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 21 minutes. (imk)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Bach, Jason)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Stipulated ESI Discovery Plan by Kimberly Brown, Des Moines University, Alicia Lynch. (Baier, Kelly)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Des Moines University. (Baier, Kelly)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Scheduling Conference shall be held on 6/18/2019 at 11:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. Counsel outside of Des Moines may attend telephonically. If they choose to do so, counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 6/14/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/22/2019. (imk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Kimberly Brown, Des Moines University, Alicia Lynch.(Baier, Kelly)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Note: Counsel should download the attached summons in compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure. (slg)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jason J. Bach. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/26/2019. (kjw)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3805109 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Alena Kelly. (Dickey, Gary)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3804973., filed by Alena Kelly. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 7/25/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/25/2019.(Dickey, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Des Moines University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Lynch
Represented By: Kelly R Baier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Brown
Represented By: Kelly R Baier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Des Moines University
Represented By: Kelly R Baier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alena Kelly
Represented By: Gary Dean Dickey, Jr
Represented By: Jason Jeffrey Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?