Tongyik v. Mmanga et al
Plaintiff: Mary Nyaruach Tongyik
Defendant: HVH Transportation, Inc. and Ken Mickson Mmanga
Case Number: 4:2019cv00136
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332md
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Nyaruach Tongyik. HVH Transportation, Inc. served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Van Horne, Amy)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Nyaruach Tongyik. Ken Mickson Mmanga served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Van Horne, Amy)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1) (slg)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3806818., filed by Mary Nyaruach Tongyik. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 7/29/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Horne, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tongyik v. Mmanga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HVH Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Mickson Mmanga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Nyaruach Tongyik
Represented By: Amy Lynn Van Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?