Copeland v. Genesis Development et al

Plaintiff: Jeromey Copeland
Defendant: Genesis Development
Case Number: 4:2019cv00138
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441fm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) filed by Genesis Development.(Laverty, Joseph)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File its reply brief to June 28, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 6/17/2019. (mlr) Modified on 6/17/2019 (mlr).
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant Reply Brief by Genesis Development.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 6/28/2019. (Laverty, Joseph)
June 12, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) or in the Alternative, Request for Leave to Amend filed by Jeromey Copeland. Replies due by 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Medical Records, #2 Exhibit B - FMLA Notification & Paperwork, #3 Exhibit C - Work Certificates, #4 Exhibit D - Staff Evaluation Documents, #5 Exhibit E - Trainings, #6 Exhibit F - About Us, #7 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Alison Kanne, #8 Exhibit H - EEOC Administrative Releases)(Kanne, Alison) Modified on 6/12/2019: Sealed Exhibit A per attorney request. (sjc)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 6/12/2019. (mlr)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 Errata Motion to Withdraw Second re #13 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Jeromey Copeland. (Kanne, Alison)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File under Seal (Second) (Unresisted) by Jeromey Copeland.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 6/26/2019. (Kanne, Alison)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File under Seal (Unresisted) by Jeromey Copeland.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 6/26/2019. (Kanne, Alison)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on #10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition. Motion hearing is set for 8/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 160- 1st Floor North before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 5/31/2019. (hfh)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) by Genesis Development.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1))(Laverty, Joseph)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Motion to Strike re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Request for Punitive Damages in Counts I - IV Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) and Motion to Dismiss Counts III & V of Plaintiff's Petition at Law and Jury Demand Pursuant to FRCP 12(b filed by Genesis Development.(Laverty, Joseph)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Request for Punitive Damages in Counts I - IV Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) and Motion to Dismiss Counts III & V of Plaintiff's Petition at Law and Jury Demand Pursuant to FRCP 12(b) filed by Jeromey Copeland. (Kanne, Alison)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Genesis Development., filed by Jeromey Copeland.(Kanne, Alison)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Request for Punitive Damages in Counts I - IV Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) and Motion to Dismiss Counts III & V of Plaintiff's Petition at Law and Jury Demand Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, to Strike Count V as Redundant and Impertinent Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) by Genesis Development. Responses due by 5/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Brief in Support Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Request for Punitive Damages in Counts I - IV Pursuant to FCRP 12(f) and Motion to Dismiss Counts III & V of Plaintiff's Petition at Law and Jury Demand Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, to Strike Count V as Redundant and Impertinent Pursuant to FRCP 12(f))(Laverty, Joseph)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Genesis Development of Defendant's Notice of Filing Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Laverty, Joseph)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Genesis Development of Defendant's Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 (Laverty, Joseph)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Genesis Development. (Laverty, Joseph)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Genesis Development from the Iowa District Court for Warren County from Warren County, Iowa, case number LACV037942. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3807433., filed by Genesis Development. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Laverty, Joseph)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H Laverty on behalf of Genesis Development (Laverty, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copeland v. Genesis Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeromey Copeland
Represented By: Alison Florence Kanne
Represented By: Steven P Wandro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Development
Represented By: Joseph H Laverty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?