Sundermann v. Golden Circle Real Estate Group, L.L.C.

Plaintiff: Carl Sundermann
Defendant: Golden Circle Real Estate Group, L.L.C. and Ryan Rohlf
Case Number: 4:2019cv00140
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Golden Circle Real Estate Group, L.L.C., Ryan Rohlf., filed by Carl Sundermann.(Paronich, Anthony)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF by Golden Circle Real Estate Group, L.L.C. re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (Lowe, Aimee)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Golden Circle Real Estate Group, L.L.C.. Responses due by 7/5/2019. (Lowe, Aimee)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to and including June 21, 2019, Golden Circle Real Estate Group, L.L.C. Answer due 6/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 6/7/2019. (mlr)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Golden Circle Real Estate Group, L.L.C..Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lowe, Aimee)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Aimee Lind Lowe on behalf of Golden Circle Real Estate Group, L.L.C. (Lowe, Aimee)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael Lueder. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 5/20/2019. (slg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3824010 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Carl Sundermann. (Lueder, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Anthony Paronich. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 5/16/2019. (kjw)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3822154 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Carl Sundermann. (Paronich, Anthony)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl Sundermann. Golden Circle Real Estate Group, L.L.C. served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Hansen, Timothy)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (vr)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Hansen on behalf of Carl Sundermann (Hansen, Timothy)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Golden Circle Real Estate Group, L.L.C. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3810091., filed by Carl Sundermann. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 7/31/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansen, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sundermann v. Golden Circle Real Estate Group, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Sundermann
Represented By: Timothy Michael Hansen
Represented By: Michael C Lueder
Represented By: Anthony Paronich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Circle Real Estate Group, L.L.C.
Represented By: Aimee Lind Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Rohlf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?