Johansen et al v. Clabaugh
Plaintiff: John Johansen and Kendra Johansen
Defendant: Jerry Foxhoven and Gerd W Clabaugh
Case Number: 4:2019cv00141
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12102
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gretchen Witte Kraemer on behalf of Gerd W Clabaugh (Kraemer, Gretchen)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief against Gerd W. Clabaugh, filed by John Johansen, Kendra Johansen. (vr)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief. Pursuant to Local Rule 15, the Clerk of Court is directed to detach and docket the amended complaint attached to the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (jeb)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief by John Johansen, Kendra Johansen.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief)(Nadipuram, Abhay)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jerry Foxhoven; Jerry Foxhoven waiver served on 5/7/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Kraemer, Gretchen)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (vr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jerry Foxhoven Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3813664., filed by John Johansen, Jennifer Johansen, Kendra Johansen. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 8/5/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nadipuram, Abhay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johansen et al v. Clabaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Foxhoven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerd W Clabaugh
Represented By: Gretchen Witte Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Johansen
Represented By: Sarah K. Franklin
Represented By: Abhay Mukund Nadipuram
Represented By: Cynthia Ann Miller
Represented By: Emily Rose Ehlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Johansen
Represented By: Sarah K. Franklin
Represented By: Abhay Mukund Nadipuram
Represented By: Cynthia Ann Miller
Represented By: Emily Rose Ehlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?