Kimball v. Altoona Police Dept et al

Plaintiff: Donald H. Kimball
Defendant: Greg Stallman and Altoona Police Dept
Case Number: 4:2019cv00149
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: James E Gritzner
2 Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983dp
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise plead by July 24, 2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/27/2019. (imk)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Plead by Altoona Police Dept, Greg Stallman.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 7/10/2019. (Palmer, Jason)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C Palmer on behalf of Altoona Police Dept, Greg Stallman (Palmer, Jason)
May 20, 2019 Judge Stephanie M. Rose added. Senior Judge James E. Gritzner no longer assigned to case. (slg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Greg Stallman) (slg)
May 17, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number IAS400021267 by Donald H. Kimball. (slg)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Donald H. Kimball. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 8/15/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (slg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimball v. Altoona Police Dept et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald H. Kimball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Stallman
Represented By: Jason C Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altoona Police Dept
Represented By: Jason C Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?