Rupe v. Citgo Petroleum Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Wayne Rupe
Defendant: Orscheln Farm and Home LLC and Citgo Petroleum Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00163
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Ross A Walters(R)
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332bw
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William L. Carr; granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bryan T. White. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 7/24/2019. (kjw)
July 24, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3876297 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Wayne Rupe. (White, Bryan)
July 24, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3876265 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Wayne Rupe. (Carr, William)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Abby L. Risner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 7/2/2019. (slg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Citgo Petroleum Corporation. (West, Angel) (Main Document 18 corrected on 7/2/2019 to indicate correct District) (kmp). Modified on 7/3/2019 removed other defendant(slg).
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Orscheln Farm and Home LLC. (West, Angel) (Main Document 17 corrected on 7/2/2019 to indicate correct District) (kmp). Modified on 7/3/2019 removed other defendant (slg).
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint by Orscheln Farm and Home LLC.(West, Angel) Modified on 7/3/2019 removed other defendant (slg).
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 Citgo Petroleum Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint by Citgo Petroleum Corporation.(West, Angel) Modified on 7/3/2019 removed other defendant(slg).
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3858091 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Citgo Petroleum Corporation, Orscheln Farm and Home LLC. (West, Angel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Angel Anna West on behalf of Citgo Petroleum Corporation, Orscheln Farm and Home LLC (West, Angel)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas V. Bender. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 6/18/2019. (slg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3847227 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Wayne Rupe. (Bender, Thomas)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dirk Hubbard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 6/18/2019. (slg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wayne Rupe. (Hubbard, Dirk)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne Rupe. Orscheln Farm and Home LLC served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Lundberg, Paul)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne Rupe. Citgo Petroleum Corporation served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Lundberg, Paul)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 ***ENTERED IN ERROR*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wayne Rupe (Lundberg, Paul) Modified on 6/17/2019 (slg).
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 ***ENTERED IN ERROR*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wayne Rupe (Lundberg, Paul) Modified on 6/17/2019 (slg).
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (don)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Orscheln Farm and Home LLC. (Lundberg, Paul) (Main Document 3 replaced and regenerated on 6/10/2019). (dmh)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Citgo Petroleum Corporation. (Lundberg, Paul) (Main Document 2 replaced and regenerated on 6/10/2019). (dmh)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3838035., filed by Wayne Rupe. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 9/4/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/4/2019.(Lundberg, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rupe v. Citgo Petroleum Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Rupe
Represented By: Paul D Lundberg
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Thomas V. Bender
Represented By: Dirk Leon Hubbard
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orscheln Farm and Home LLC
Represented By: Angel Anna West
Represented By: Abby Lynn Risner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citgo Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Angel Anna West
Represented By: Abby Lynn Risner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?